NY S07278 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the Lt. Cameron N. Hall Memorial Bridge; corrects the New York state bridge number.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the Lt. Cameron N. Hall Memorial Bridge; corrects the New York state bridge number.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18AssemblySIGNED CHAP.8
2018-04-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-02-27Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-02-27Assemblypassed assembly
2018-02-27Assemblyordered to third reading cal.685
2018-02-27Assemblysubstituted for a9037
2018-01-16Assemblyreferred to transportation
2018-01-16SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-16SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-01-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.6
2018-01-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A09037 (Same As) 2018-02-27 - substituted by s7278

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback