NY A09021 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.445
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.445
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the refinancing of outstanding indebtedness of certain not-for-profit hospitals.
Title
Relates to the refinancing of outstanding indebtedness of certain not-for-profit hospitals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | signed chap.445 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1675 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7387A |
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.465 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.465 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | print number 9021d |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | print number 9021c |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | print number 9021b |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | print number 9021a |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2014-03-07 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07387 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9021D