NY A09019 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - ordered to third reading rules cal.182
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - ordered to third reading rules cal.182
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes permissible payment methods, advance consent for direct payments, and annually providing the updated rate schedule as required terms for certain insurance contracts.
Title
Includes permissible payment methods, advance consent for direct payments, and annually providing the updated rate schedule as required terms for certain insurance contracts.
Sponsors
Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] |
Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.182 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.182 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-17 | Assembly | print number 9019a |
2024-05-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to insurance |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S08414 (Same As) 2024-05-21 - PRINT NUMBER 8414A