NY A09008 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to making an appropriation to pay Debra Gordon, widow of the late William R. Nojay, member of the assembly from the one hundredth thirty-third assembly district, the balance due of his unpaid annual compensation for a portion of the year 2016.
Title
Relates to making an appropriation to pay Debra Gordon, widow of the late William R. Nojay, member of the assembly from the one hundredth thirty-third assembly district, the balance due of his unpaid annual compensation for a portion of the year 2016.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Senate | tabled |
2018-03-02 | Senate | vetoed memo.3 |
2018-02-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-02-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.485 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7429 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.5 |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.5 |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07429 (Same As) 2018-02-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9008