NY A09002 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the disclosure of the identities of political committees making certain expenditures for political communications.
Title
Relates to the disclosure of the identities of political committees making certain expenditures for political communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.87 |
2020-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-03-02 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-03-02 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-03-02 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.435 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | substituted for a9002 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | referred to election law |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.205 |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | substituted by s7313 |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.435 |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S07313 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.87