NY A08982 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adjusts the base pilotage tariffs at Sandy Hook, Sands Point and Execution Rocks for vessels over 1650 pilotage units.
Title
Adjusts the base pilotage tariffs at Sandy Hook, Sands Point and Execution Rocks for vessels over 1650 pilotage units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | print number 8982a |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S08469 (Same As) 2024-03-28 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING