NY A08966 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to water saving performance standards and establishes certain threshold amounts.
Title
Relates to water saving performance standards and establishes certain threshold amounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.65 |
2020-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-02-03 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-02-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-02-03 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.370 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | substituted for a8966 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.39 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | substituted by s6960 |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.370 |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06960 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.65