NY A08955 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - substituted by s7306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - substituted by s7306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates testing in the event of a motor vehicle collision resulting in injury or death.
Title
Mandates testing in the event of a motor vehicle collision resulting in injury or death.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Assembly | substituted by s7306 |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.680 |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07306 (Same As) 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.27