NY A08930 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the canvassing of primary returns by the board of elections.
Title
Relates to the canvassing of primary returns by the board of elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.492 |
2014-03-12 | Assembly | reported |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S07437 (Same As) 2014-05-15 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS