NY A08875 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - signed chap.540
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - signed chap.540
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the installation of carbon monoxide detectors in restaurants and other commercial buildings in NYC.
Title
Requires the installation of carbon monoxide detectors in restaurants and other commercial buildings in NYC.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-29 | Senate | signed chap.540 |
2014-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1518 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7677 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.175 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.175 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | print number 8875c |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2014-03-12 | Assembly | print number 8875b |
2014-03-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | print number 8875a |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2014-02-25 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06657 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8963A
S07677 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8875C
S07677 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8875C