NY A08874 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s8063a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s8063a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to restrictions on consecutive hours of work for nurses; provides circumstances for the reinstatement of limitations on mandatory overtime; provides for civil penalties for employers who violate work hours limitations.
Title
Relates to restrictions on consecutive hours of work for nurses; provides circumstances for the reinstatement of limitations on mandatory overtime; provides for civil penalties for employers who violate work hours limitations.
Sponsors
Asm. Latoya Joyner [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Taylor Darling [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] |
Asm. Michael Durso [R] | Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s8063a |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.615 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 8874b |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 8874a |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S08063 (Same As) 2022-12-30 - VETOED MEMO.193