NY A08871 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to guidelines for local area agencies on aging relating to assistance for informal caregivers.
Title
Relates to guidelines for local area agencies on aging relating to assistance for informal caregivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Senate | signed chap.269 |
2014-08-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.830 |
2014-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7255 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.578 |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | reported |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-02-25 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S07255 (Same As) 2014-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8871