NY S07255 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8871
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8871
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to guidelines for local area agencies on aging relating to assistance for informal caregivers.
Title
Relates to guidelines for local area agencies on aging relating to assistance for informal caregivers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8871 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.830 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A08871 (Same As) 2014-08-11 - signed chap.269