NY A08869 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-11-22 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-11-22 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a comprehensive electric vehicle fast charging station implementation plan; requires the New York state energy and research development authority to further establish a "Fast Charge NY working group" to develop such plan; makes related provisions.
Title
Establishes a comprehensive electric vehicle fast charging station implementation plan; requires the New York state energy and research development authority to further establish a "Fast Charge NY working group" to develop such plan; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-11-22 | Assembly | tabled |
2024-11-22 | Assembly | vetoed memo.41 |
2024-11-15 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-06-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1552 |
2024-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S489A |
2024-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-03-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.385 |
2024-03-26 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-25 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S00489 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8869