NY A08869 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - approval memo.14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to accountable care organizations which are certified by the department of health to provide integrated health services and reduce health care costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to accountable care organizations which are certified by the department of health to provide integrated health services and reduce health care costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03Senateapproval memo.14
2012-10-03Senatesigned chap.461
2012-09-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.1465
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6228B
2012-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-12Assemblyamended on third reading 8869b
2012-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.101
2012-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.101
2012-06-11Assemblyreported
2012-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-05-29Assemblyprint number 8869a
2012-05-29Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2012-01-31Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S06228 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8869B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08869&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08869&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08869
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08869&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08869A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08869&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08869B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08869&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/A8869#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback