NY S06228 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8869B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8869B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to accountable care organizations which are certified by the department of health to provide integrated health services and reduce health care costs.
Title
Relates to accountable care organizations which are certified by the department of health to provide integrated health services and reduce health care costs.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. Owen Johnson [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] |
Sen. Jack Martins [R] | Sen. Roy McDonald [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8869B |
2012-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1465 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6228B |
2012-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-05-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6228A |
2012-05-29 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2012-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08869 (Same As) 2012-10-03 - approval memo.14