NY A08868 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s8411
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s8411
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deems an application filed with the New York state and local police and fire retirement system by the widow of Paul C. Adam as timely filed.
Title
Deems an application filed with the New York state and local police and fire retirement system by the widow of Paul C. Adam as timely filed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s8411 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.618 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-01-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08411 (Same As) 2024-09-11 - SIGNED CHAP.314