NY A08763 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the recall power of the electors to remove an elective officer.
Title
Provides for the recall power of the electors to remove an elective officer.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-12-04 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2017-11-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2017-11-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02089 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY