NY A08747 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the effectiveness of the New York state ocean acidification task force from January 1, 2019 to January 1, 2022.
Title
Relates to extending the effectiveness of the New York state ocean acidification task force from January 1, 2019 to January 1, 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2018-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2108 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7211 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.747 |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | reported |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2017-10-25 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07211 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8747