NY S07211 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8747
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8747
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the effectiveness of the New York state ocean acidification task force from January 1, 2019 to January 1, 2022.
Title
Relates to extending the effectiveness of the New York state ocean acidification task force from January 1, 2019 to January 1, 2022.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8747 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2108 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08747 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES