NY A08694 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-05 - print number 8694a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-05 - print number 8694a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system otherwise known as the "3rd Street Bridge" as the "Dr. Martin Luther King Jr. - Michael Henry Schwerner Memorial Bridge" connecting Mount Vernon, county of Westchester with the town of Pelham, county of Westchester.
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system otherwise known as the "3rd Street Bridge" as the "Dr. Martin Luther King Jr. - Michael Henry Schwerner Memorial Bridge" connecting Mount Vernon, county of Westchester with the town of Pelham, county of Westchester.
Sponsors
Asm. Gary Pretlow [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | Assembly | print number 8694a |
2020-06-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-10-23 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S08491 (Same As) 2020-06-09 - referred to transportation