NY S08491 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system otherwise known as the "3rd Street Bridge" as the "Dr. Martin Luther King Jr. - Michael Henry Schwerner Memorial Bridge" connecting Mount Vernon, county of Westchester with the town of Pelham, county of Westchester.
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system otherwise known as the "3rd Street Bridge" as the "Dr. Martin Luther King Jr. - Michael Henry Schwerner Memorial Bridge" connecting Mount Vernon, county of Westchester with the town of Pelham, county of Westchester.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2020-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.747 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08694 (Same As) 2020-06-05 - print number 8694a