NY A08694 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes, in certain cases, the provision of private duty nursing services to a medical assistance recipient by a relative who is a registered professional nurse.
Title
Authorizes, in certain cases, the provision of private duty nursing services to a medical assistance recipient by a relative who is a registered professional nurse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-10-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06054 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - referred to ways and means