NY A08675 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Introduced on October 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-22 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-22 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to penalties for the crimes relating to methamphetamine laboratory operations, including criminal possession of methamphetamine manufacturing materials and unlawful manufacture of methamphetamines.
Title
Relates to penalties for the crimes relating to methamphetamine laboratory operations, including criminal possession of methamphetamine manufacturing materials and unlawful manufacture of methamphetamines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-10-27 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07084 (Same As) 2012-04-27 - REFERRED TO CODES