NY A08646 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing cull permits to certified nuisance wildlife specialists; authorizes the department of environmental conservation, after a review of the site-specific wildlife management plan, and upon a finding that wildlife has become a nuisance, destructive to public or private property or a threat to public health or welfare, to issue a certified nuisance wildlife specialist a cull permit; defines terms.
Title
Relates to authorizing cull permits to certified nuisance wildlife specialists; authorizes the department of environmental conservation, after a review of the site-specific wildlife management plan, and upon a finding that wildlife has become a nuisance, destructive to public or private property or a threat to public health or welfare, to issue a certified nuisance wildlife specialist a cull permit; defines terms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.298 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.298 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | print number 8646c |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | print number 8646b |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | print number 8646a |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06853 (Same As) 2018-04-30 - referred to environmental conservation