NY A08618 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-05 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-05 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires registration and the disclosure of information relating to lobbying for the nomination or confirmation of persons to state office.
Title
Requires registration and the disclosure of information relating to lobbying for the nomination or confirmation of persons to state office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2024-01-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07883 (Same As) 2024-03-26 - referred to governmental operations