NY S07883 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires registration and the disclosure of information relating to lobbying for the nomination or confirmation of persons to state office.
Title
Requires registration and the disclosure of information relating to lobbying for the nomination or confirmation of persons to state office.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Gianaris [D] | Sen. Jabari Brisport [D] | Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] | Sen. Kristen Gonzalez [D] |
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2024-03-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.145 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | REFERENCE CHANGED TO JUDICIARY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08618 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - reported referred to rules