NY A08604 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - approval memo.32
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - approval memo.32
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that coverage and access to non-invasive prenatal testing under medicaid shall not be limited based upon the age of the pregnant patient.
Title
Provides that coverage and access to non-invasive prenatal testing under medicaid shall not be limited based upon the age of the pregnant patient.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-23 | Assembly | approval memo.32 |
2022-11-23 | Assembly | signed chap.650 |
2022-11-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1774 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8157 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.208 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.208 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08157 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8604