NY A08586 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s7107b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s7107b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to supported decision-making by people with intellectual, developmental, cognitive and psychosocial disabilities.
Title
Relates to supported decision-making by people with intellectual, developmental, cognitive and psychosocial disabilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D] | Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] |
Asm. Marjorie Byrnes [R] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | substituted by s7107b |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.412 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 8586b |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to mental health |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | print number 8586a |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to mental health |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2021-12-22 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S07107 (Same As) 2022-07-26 - SIGNED CHAP.481