NY A08562 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disaster preparedness.
Title
Relates to disaster preparedness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | tabled |
2016-11-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.241 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1560 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6446 |
2016-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.798 |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | print number 8562a |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-10-30 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06446 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8562A