NY A08553 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - substituted by s8057
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - substituted by s8057
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the controlling disposition of a decedent's remains; adds domestic partners and removes grandparents, aunts, uncles, cousins, nieces or nephews from having such controlling interest.
Title
Relates to the controlling disposition of a decedent's remains; adds domestic partners and removes grandparents, aunts, uncles, cousins, nieces or nephews from having such controlling interest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-23 | Assembly | substituted by s8057 |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.260 |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08057 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - SIGNED CHAP.15