NY A08540 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.516
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.516
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires same-day notification of a parent or person in parental relation of a student with a disability where certain behavioral interventions are used.
Title
Requires same-day notification of a parent or person in parental relation of a student with a disability where certain behavioral interventions are used.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | Assembly | signed chap.516 |
2022-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1154 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7548A |
2022-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.551 |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | reported |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | print number 8540a |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07548 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8540A