NY A08540 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Introduced on August 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - ordered to third reading rules cal.183
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - ordered to third reading rules cal.183
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a person, firm, partnership, association, limited liability company, corporation, or other entity may sell or offer to sell a child restraint system if the retailer: (a) maintains in stock and prominently displays within the store, the child restraint alarms for sale that are compatible with such child restraint systems; and (b) posts a notice, in a conspicuous location which may be easily seen or reached by customers, in legible format, which states: "Heat stroke is the leading cause of non-car crash vehicular death in children under the age of 15. Child restraint alarms, when used properly, may help to prevent vehicular death of children."; defines terms; imposes a civil penalty.
Title
Provides that a person, firm, partnership, association, limited liability company, corporation, or other entity may sell or offer to sell a child restraint system if the retailer: (a) maintains in stock and prominently displays within the store, the child restraint alarms for sale that are compatible with such child restraint systems; and (b) posts a notice, in a conspicuous location which may be easily seen or reached by customers, in legible format, which states: "Heat stroke is the leading cause of non-car crash vehicular death in children under the age of 15. Child restraint alarms, when used properly, may help to prevent vehicular death of children."; defines terms; imposes a civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.183 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.183 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S07552 (Same As) 2020-01-24 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION