NY A08537 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - signed chap.41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - signed chap.41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the capital access program; focuses on minority and women-owned business enterprises and small businesses located in highly distressed areas to assist them in processing and being approved for qualifying program loans; requires the engagement in outreach and marketing to financial institutions to increase awareness of the program.
Title
Relates to the capital access program; focuses on minority and women-owned business enterprises and small businesses located in highly distressed areas to assist them in processing and being approved for qualifying program loans; requires the engagement in outreach and marketing to financial institutions to increase awareness of the program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Assembly | signed chap.41 |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-01-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-31 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.73 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8094 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.249 |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S08094 (Same As) 2024-01-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8537