NY A08519 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-28 - substituted by s5644b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-28 - substituted by s5644b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to limits on certain supplementary insurance; requires notice of procedures for rejecting supplementary uninsured/underinsured motorists coverage; new policies.
Title
Relates to limits on certain supplementary insurance; requires notice of procedures for rejecting supplementary uninsured/underinsured motorists coverage; new policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Assembly | substituted by s5644b |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 8519a |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.637 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.637 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-18 | Assembly | referred to insurance |