NY S05644 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.56
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to limits on certain supplementary insurance; requires notice of procedures for rejecting supplementary uninsured/underinsured motorists coverage; new policies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to limits on certain supplementary insurance; requires notice of procedures for rejecting supplementary uninsured/underinsured motorists coverage; new policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-18AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.56
2017-12-18AssemblySIGNED CHAP.490
2017-12-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-28Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-28Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-28Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.637
2017-06-28Assemblysubstituted for a8519a
2017-06-22Assemblyreferred to insurance
2017-06-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-21SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2211
2017-06-21SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-06-18SenatePRINT NUMBER 5644B
2017-06-18SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE
2017-05-11SenatePRINT NUMBER 5644A
2017-05-11SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE
2017-04-24SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE

Same As/Similar To

A05445 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.385
A08519 (Same As) 2017-06-28 - substituted by s5644b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05644&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05644&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05644
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05644&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05644A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05644&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05644B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5644#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5644#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05644&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback