NY A08517 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a written agreement for flexibility of operating funds for certain video lottery gaming facilities within Oneida county and within fifteen miles of a Native American class III gaming facility.
Title
Requires a written agreement for flexibility of operating funds for certain video lottery gaming facilities within Oneida county and within fifteen miles of a Native American class III gaming facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | recommitted to ways and means |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8517a |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.607 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.690 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.690 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2017-06-18 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |