NY A08504 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on August 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-17 - print number 8504c
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-17 - print number 8504c
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public agencies and private employers to adopt a policy that requires the public agency or private employer to provide a person who has been convicted of a crime an opportunity to submit an explanation of the facts surrounding the offense and conviction and any other information the person deems relevant to the issue prior to making a determination regarding the convicted person's employment or a determination to refuse to issue a license to such person; requires contracts not be terminated, canceled or not renewed due to a conviction without an opportunity to submit an explanation.
Title
Requires public agencies and private employers to adopt a policy that requires the public agency or private employer to provide a person who has been convicted of a crime an opportunity to submit an explanation of the facts surrounding the offense and conviction and any other information the person deems relevant to the issue prior to making a determination regarding the convicted person's employment or a determination to refuse to issue a license to such person; requires contracts not be terminated, canceled or not renewed due to a conviction without an opportunity to submit an explanation.
Sponsors
Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] |
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Diane Richardson [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-17 | Assembly | print number 8504c |
2020-08-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | print number 8504b |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | print number 8504a |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2019-08-07 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S08043 (Same As) 2020-08-05 - PRINT NUMBER 8043A