NY A08482 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - print number 8482a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - print number 8482a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the registration of autocycles, which are three-wheeled motor vehicles that have a steering wheel and seating which does not require the operator to sit with a leg on either side of the seat; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Title
Requires the registration of autocycles, which are three-wheeled motor vehicles that have a steering wheel and seating which does not require the operator to sit with a leg on either side of the seat; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | Assembly | print number 8482a |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07857 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - referred to transportation