NY S07857 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the registration of autocycles, which are three-wheeled motor vehicles that have a steering wheel and seating which does not require the operator to sit with a leg on either side of the seat; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Title
Requires the registration of autocycles, which are three-wheeled motor vehicles that have a steering wheel and seating which does not require the operator to sit with a leg on either side of the seat; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2018-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.769 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08482 (Same As) 2018-02-16 - print number 8482a