NY A08453 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on December 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-02 - signed chap.658
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on December 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-02 - signed chap.658
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the website of each contractor and vendor who provides services pursuant to a state contract to conform any website provided pursuant to such contract with the most current version of the Web Content Accessibility Guidelines adopted by the World Wide Web Consortium for accessibility, or any successor standards.
Title
Requires the website of each contractor and vendor who provides services pursuant to a state contract to conform any website provided pursuant to such contract with the most current version of the Web Content Accessibility Guidelines adopted by the World Wide Web Consortium for accessibility, or any successor standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-02 | Assembly | signed chap.658 |
2022-12-02 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1856 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7572A |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.136 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.136 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | print number 8453a |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-11-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07572 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8453A