NY A08426 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - substituted by s6806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - substituted by s6806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting a retroactive property tax exemption to Ohr Heameth the American Society for Torah Education in Latin America for the 2015-2016 assessment roll for the 2016 general taxes and the 2016-2017 assessment roll for the 2016-2017 school taxes and 2017 general taxes.
Title
Relates to permitting a retroactive property tax exemption to Ohr Heameth the American Society for Torah Education in Latin America for the 2015-2016 assessment roll for the 2016 general taxes and the 2016-2017 assessment roll for the 2016-2017 school taxes and 2017 general taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Assembly | substituted by s6806 |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.604 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.666 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.666 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06806 (Same As) 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.5