NY S06806 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting a retroactive property tax exemption to Ohr Heameth the American Society for Torah Education in Latin America for the 2015-2016 assessment roll for the 2016 general taxes and the 2016-2017 assessment roll for the 2016-2017 school taxes and 2017 general taxes.
Title
Relates to permitting a retroactive property tax exemption to Ohr Heameth the American Society for Torah Education in Latin America for the 2015-2016 assessment roll for the 2016 general taxes and the 2016-2017 assessment roll for the 2016-2017 school taxes and 2017 general taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.5 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-03-28 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-03-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-03-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.604 |
2018-03-28 | Assembly | substituted for a8426 |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.565 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08426 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - substituted by s6806