NY A08416 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - print number 8416a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - print number 8416a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the maximum award available under the historic preservation tax credit from five million dollars to nine million dollars over a period of two years.
Title
Increases the maximum award available under the historic preservation tax credit from five million dollars to nine million dollars over a period of two years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Assembly | print number 8416a |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05161 (Same As) 2018-02-13 - PRINT NUMBER 5161B