NY A08387 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - print number 8387c
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - print number 8387c
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the workers' compensation board's authority to resolve medical bill disputes and simplify the process.
Title
Extends the workers' compensation board's authority to resolve medical bill disputes and simplify the process.
Sponsors
Asm. Gary Pretlow [D] | Asm. Alfred Taylor [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Philip Palmesano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | print number 8387c |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | print number 8387b |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | print number 8387a |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S08812 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - PRINT NUMBER 8812A