NY A08360 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - print number 8360a
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - print number 8360a
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the chief administrator of the courts to establish veterans treatment courts; and relates to the removal of certain actions to veterans treatment courts.
Title
Authorizes the chief administrator of the courts to establish veterans treatment courts; and relates to the removal of certain actions to veterans treatment courts.
Sponsors
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
Asm. Brian Manktelow [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Assembly | print number 8360a |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05059 (Same As) 2020-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5059A