NY A08328 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - signed chap.83
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - signed chap.83
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of state route 70 in county of Allegany, as the "Sergeant Omar G. Blowers Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of state route 70 in county of Allegany, as the "Sergeant Omar G. Blowers Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Senate | signed chap.83 |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1487 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6116A |
2014-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.156 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.156 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | print number 8328a |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-12-18 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06116 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8328A