NY S06116 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8328A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8328A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of state route 70 in the village of Canaseraga, county of Allegany, as the "Sergeant Omar G. Blowers Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of state route 70 in the village of Canaseraga, county of Allegany, as the "Sergeant Omar G. Blowers Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8328A |
2014-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1487 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6116A |
2014-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08328 (Same As) 2014-07-03 - signed chap.83