NY A08295 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-30 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the miscalculation of benefits paid to Katherine Sweeney.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the miscalculation of benefits paid to Katherine Sweeney.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-30Senatetabled
2020-11-30Senatevetoed memo.70
2020-11-18Assemblydelivered to governor
2020-07-22SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-22Senate3RD READING CAL.890
2020-07-22SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6420A
2020-06-09SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-06-09Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-06-09Assemblypassed assembly
2020-06-09Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.71
2020-06-09Assemblyrules report cal.71
2020-06-09Assemblyreported
2020-06-09Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-06-06Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2020-04-08Assemblyprint number 8295a
2020-04-08Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental employees
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2019-06-13Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S06420 (Same As) 2020-11-30 - tabled

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A8295
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08295&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08295
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08295&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08295A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08295&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08295&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08295&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A8295#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback