NY A08293 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s6622a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s6622a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the liability of design professionals; prohibits broad indemnification of a state or local agency or political subdivision involving public work for contracts executed on or after January 1, 2019.
Title
Relates to the liability of design professionals; prohibits broad indemnification of a state or local agency or political subdivision involving public work for contracts executed on or after January 1, 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6622a |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.445 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | print number 8293a |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06622 (Same As) 2018-08-17 - VETOED MEMO.265